MS SC598 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Booneville High School "lady Blue Devils" Girls Fast-pitch Softball Team And Coach Jessica Taylor For Winning Their First Mhsaa Class 3a State Championship.
Title
Commend Booneville "Lady Blue Devils" Girls Fast-Pitch Softball Team for winning 2021 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |