MS SC518 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Honoring Internationally Acclaimed Mississippi Actor Morgan Freeman Upon His Receipt Of The Sag Life Achievement Award At The 2018 Screen Actors Guild Awards Ceremony And Thanking Him For His Humanitarian And Civic Contributions To The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Honoring Mississippi Actor Morgan Freeman for receiving the SAG Life Achievement Award at 2018 Screen Actors Guild Ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |