MS SB3035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Examiners For Licensed Professional Counselors For Fiscal Year 2020.
Title
Appropriation; Counselors, Board of Examiners for Licensed Professional.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |