MS SB3023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 933, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, To Extend Through Fiscal Year 2015, The Authority Of The Board Of Supervisors Of Lafayette County, Mississippi, To Contribute Annually To The Oxford-lafayette County Economic Development Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lafayette County; extend authority to contribute to the Oxford Lafayette County Economic Development Foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-30 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-30 | Passed | |
2012-04-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2012-04-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-23 | Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-03 | Referred To Local and Private |