MS SB3010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 928, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 934, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, As Amended By Chapter 919, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tunica County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc., Through Calendar Year 2024; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tunica County; authorize contributions to the Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed |
2020-06-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |