MS SB2858 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-115-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $45,000,000.00 The Aggregate Amount Of Investment Tax Credits That May Be Allocated To Participating Investors Of Mississippi Small Business Investment Companies Under The Mississippi Small Business Investment Company Act; To Provide The Taxable Years In Which Participating Investors May Claim The Additional Credits So Allocated Against Their Premium Tax Liability; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Small Business Investment Company Act; increase the amount of investment tax credits that can be allocated under.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] |
Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-16 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2023-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Criswell, Lamar, Steverson) |
2023-03-13 | House | Passed |
2023-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |