MS SB2752 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 27-7-22.7 And 27-7-22.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide An Income Tax Credit For Income Taxpayers That Use Port Facilities At State, County And Municipal Ports For The Export Of Cargo And Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Report Annually To The Legislature Regarding The Impact Of Such Tax Credit; To Amend Reenacted Sections 27-7-22.7 And 27-7-22.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Certain Technical Changes; To Amend Section 4, Chapter 492, Laws Of 1994, As Last Amended By Section 3, Chapter 377, Laws Of 2012, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On Sections 27-7-22.7 And 27-7-22.9; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repeal date on tax credit for certain charges for using certain port facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Vetoed | |
2016-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Finance |