MS SB2728 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, Acting On Behalf Of The University Of Mississippi To Enter Into A Long-term Lease Of All Or Any Portion Of Real Property Under Its Control And Possession For The Purpose Of Developing Academic Buildings, Housing, Dining Halls, Parking Facilities, And/or Other Spaces, Including Retail Developments, For The Benefit Of The University; To Provide That Any Such Property Shall Be Leased For A Period Not To Exceed 30 Years; To Set Certain Other Lease Terms And To Require Any Lease To Be Subject To The Approval Of I.h.l.; To Authorize The University Of Mississippi To Negotiate All Aspects Of Any Lease With The Approval Of I.h.l.; To Provide That All Proceeds Derived From Any Such Lease Shall Be Deposited Into A Special Fund Only For The Use Of The University; To Require Any Property Leased Under This Act To Revert Back To The University At The End Of The Lease; And For Related Purposes.
Title
University of Mississippi; authorize to enter long-term lease with approval of I.H.L.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2024-04-17 | House | Conferees Named Scoggin,Deweese,Hawkins |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Scoggin,Deweese,Bounds |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Boyd,DeLano,Sparks |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To UC |
2024-03-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: UC To AP |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations A |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: UC To AP |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |