MS SB2728 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-11-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Grant All Persons Who Are Contributing Members Of The Supplemental Legislative Retirement Plan On July 1, 2018, A One-time Option To Withdraw From Membership In The Plan; To Provide That Upon Exercising This Option The Contributions To The Plan By The Member Shall Cease And The Person's Accumulated Contributions To The Plan Shall Be Paid To Him Or Her; To Provide That This Option Must Be Exercised Before September 1, 2018; To Provide That Persons Who Are Elected As Members Of The State Legislature Or President Of The Senate For Terms Beginning After July 1, 2018, And Who Previously Served As Members Of The Legislature Or President Of The Senate But Were Not A Member Of The State Legislature On July 1, 2018, Shall Have The Option Of Withdrawing From Membership In The Supplemental Legislative Retirement Plan; To Provide That The Person's Accumulated Contributions To The Plan Shall Be Paid To Him Or Her; To Provide That Once Exercised, This Option Shall Be Permanent; To Provide That All Persons Who Become Members Of The State Legislature For The First Time After July 1,2018, And The Persons Who Become The President Of The Senate For The First Time After July 1, 2018, Shall Not Become Members Of The Supplemental Legislative Retirement Plan; And For Related Purposes.
Title
SLRP; authorize current members to opt out and close for persons first elected after July 1, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/SB/SB2728.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2728IN.htm |