MS SB2715 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-33-173, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Confidential Relationship Between Deaf, Hard Of Hearing Or Deafblind Consumers And The Person Who Engages The Services Of An Interpreter, To Revise The Definition Of Certification Entities, To Revise Qualifications For Registration As An Interpreter, To Provide That The Registering Authority Shall Provide Quality Assurance Evaluation For The Interpreter Registration Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Interpreter Registration Law; clarify confidentiality, update definitions, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-23 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |