MS SB2653 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That It Shall Be Unlawful For Any Union, Labor Union Or Agency Thereof To Singly Or In Concert With Others, To Engage In Mass Picketing Or Mass Demonstrations In Such A Manner As To Obstruct Or Unreasonably Interfere With Free Ingress Or Egress Of Any Person To And From Any Place Of Business Or A Private Residence; It Shall Be Unlawful For Any Union, Labor Union Or Agency Thereof To Obstruct Or Unreasonably Interfere With Free Ingress Or Egress Of Any Person To And From Any Place Of Business Or Private Residence; To Authorize Any Business Or Person Subjected To Such Unlawful Act To Seek Injunctive Relief Without The Showing Of Irreparable Harm; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Labor unions; prohibit mass picketing of a residence or place of business.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] | Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 68 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 68 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Turner, Crawford) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |