MS SB2650 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 47-5-901, 47-5-903, 47-5-905, 47-5-907 And 47-5-909, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize The Department Of Corrections To House State Offenders In County Jails; To Reenact And Amend Section 47-5-911, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repeal Date To July 1, 2018, For Sections 47-5-901 Through 47-5-911; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State offenders; extend repeal date on MDOC's authority to house in county jails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/history/SB/SB2650.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2650IN.htm |