MS SB2632 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Statewide Monetary Assessments On Certain Violations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Statewide monetary assessments; revise.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Blount,Ward |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Frierson,Watson |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JA |
2013-02-28 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JA To AP |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |