MS SB2438 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-11-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That With Respect To Certain Investments Made By The Public Employees Retirement System That Are In The Form Of A Separate Managed Account, Or A Limited Partnership Or Commingled Fund, Any Person Or Entity Who Exercises Any Discretionary Authority Or Discretionary Control Respecting Management Of The Separate Account, Limited Partnership Or Commingled Fund, Or Who Exercises Any Authority Or Control Respecting Management Or Disposition Of The Assets Of The Separate Account, Limited Partnership Or Commingled Fund, Shall Exercise Such Authority Or Control As A Fiduciary; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Retirement; provide that persons who exercise control over certain PERS investments shall act as fiduciaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | Referred To Finance |