MS SB2431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-43-21 And 37-43-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That Any Textbook Supplier With Whom The State Board Of Education Has Contracted To Provide All Of The State's Textbooks Shall Maintain A Depository In The State Of Mississippi; To Provide That Such Supplier May Have A Depository Within The State Or In A Regional Area Located In Reasonable Proximity To The State; To Amend Section 37-43-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Internal References And Correct Grammatical Errors; To Amend Sections 37-43-33 And 37-43-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; To Bring Forward Sections 37-43-1, 37-43-2, 37-43-17, 37-43-19, 37-43-24, 37-43-25, 37-43-27, 37-43-29, 37-43-39, 37-43-41, 37-43-43, 37-43-45, 37-43-47, 37-43-51 And 37-43-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendments; To Repeal Sections 37-43-37, 37-43-49, 37-43-53 And 37-43-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are Various Obsolete Provisions Of The Mississippi Textbook Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Procedure for the purchase of textbooks by the State Board of Education; revise provisions of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 43 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 37 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 49 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 53 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 55 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 43 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |