MS SB2398 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 65-43-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend From 30 To 40 Years The Maximum Period Of Time That Revenue Bonds Issued By Counties Or Municipalities For Toll Roads And Toll Bridges May Mature; To Amend Section 65-43-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Revenue bonds for toll roads and bridges; extend the maximum period of time that they may mature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To WM |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Transportation;Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To FI |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance |