MS SB2333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Prescribe And Charge A Fee To Defray The Costs Of Shipping Alcoholic Beverages Through Its Alcoholic Beverage Control (abc) Division; To Amend Section 27-71-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury Known As The "abc Shipping Fund"; To Provide For The Deposit Of Shipping Fees Charged By The Department Into The Abc Shipping Fund For Use In Defraying The Department's Expenses In Shipping Alcoholic Beverages; To Provide That Net Proceeds Remaining In The Fund After Subtracting The Amount Used To Defray Shipping Costs Shall Lapse Into The General Fund On August 1 Of Every Year; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fees; authorize Department of Revenue to charge and place in special fund to defray costs of shipping alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Reconsidered |
2020-06-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Steverson) |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Finance |