MS SB2314 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify Section 41-29-146.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Misdemeanor Of Falsely Representing A Substance To Be A Controlled Substance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; misdemeanor of falsely representing a substance to be.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-11 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-07 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |