MS SB2225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Disabled Veteran Shall Only Be Required To Provide A United States Department Of Veterans Affairs Health Services Identification Card In Order To Obtain A Concealed Weapons Permit; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Disabled veteran with service-connected disability; clarify procedure for concealed weapons permit.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] |
Sen. Kathy Chism [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JB To MA |
2020-05-29 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To JB |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Military Affairs;Judiciary B |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | DR - TSDP: VM To JB |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Judiciary, Division B |