MS SB2138 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Creating A New Section 3-3-66, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Designating The Mississippi Opal As The State Gemstone; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism; designate the Mississippi Opal as the state gemstone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Tourism |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |