MS SB2055 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Person Is Convicted Of Possession Of Alcoholic Beverages, Beer Or Light Wine In A Location In Which Such Possession Is Prohibited By Law Or Convicted Of Underage Possession Of Alcoholic Beverages, Beer Or Light Wine, The Alcoholic Beverage, Light Wine, Beer Or Raw Material That Is Seized In Connection With Such Violation May Be Disposed Of In The Manner Prescribed By The Department Of Revenue; To Amend Sections 67-1-37 And 67-3-74, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Crimes Involving Beer And Alcoholic Beverages That The Department Of Revenue Is Authorized To Enforce; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue; revise disposal of seized alcohol if possessor is convicted of illegal possession & expand enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-16 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,White |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Blackwell |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2016-03-23 | House | Amended |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Finance |