MS SB2035 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Michael Todd Manual Of Rankin County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Michael Todd Manual of Rankin County, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-04-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |