MS HR72 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Accomplishments Of Mississippi Native Son, Dr. Leslie Ray Matthews, For Advancements Made In Vitamin D Research And Treatments.
Title
Dr. Leslie Ray Matthews; commend and congratulate upon successful accomplishment in promotion of Vitamin D research.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred To Rules |