MS HR3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life, Service And Legacy Of Mrs. Ella Sellers Street And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To Her Family And Friends Upon Her Passing.
Title
Mrs. Ella Sellers Street; commend life, service and legacy upon her passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-11 | Adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Rules |