MS HR124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Esteemed And Laudable Legislative Career And Public Service Of The Most Honorable And Distinguished Gentleman From Harrison, The "ironman," "dean" And "godfather" Of The Mississippi Legislature, Senator Thomas Arlin "tommy" Gollott, Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement From The Mississippi Senate.
Title
Senator Thomas A. "Tommy" Gollott; commend distinguished legislative career and public service upon the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |