MS HR110 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Rich And Historical Legacy Of The City Of Ridgeland, Mississippi, And Congratulating The City Upon The Occasion Of Its Quasquicentennial Anniversary, Acknowledging 125 Years Of Excellence.
Title
City of Ridgeland; commend upon the 125th anniversary of its founding.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |