MS HB863 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide An Income Tax Credit For Taxpayers Who Are First-time Homebuyers Of A Principal Residence In This State; To Provide For The Amount Of The Tax Credit; To Provide For The Recapture Of The Tax Credit Under Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; authorize a credit for first-time homebuyers of principal residence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-16 Died In Committee
2010-02-26 Referred To Finance
2010-02-26 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-24 Passed As Amended
2010-02-24 Amended
2010-02-24 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-02-23 Read the Third Time
2010-02-23 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-01-18 Referred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback