MS HB631 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-16-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Uniform Basic Skills Tests Shall Be Administered To Preserve The Integrity And Validity Of The Assessment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform basic skills testing standards; preserve integrity and validity of assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-11 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-18 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-02 | Amended | |
2010-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-12 | Referred To Education |