MS HB519 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-19-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement For Apportioned Vehicles To Have A Decal Specifying The Month And Year Of Expiration Attached To The License Tag; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle license tags; remove requirement for apportioned vehicles to have decal with expiration month/year on tag.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |