MS HB510 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-21-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Limit The Period For Which The Mississippi Department Of Revenue Is Required To Retain Motor Vehicle Certificates Of Title To Fifteen Years From The Date Of Issuance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle certificate of title; limit period for which Department of Revenue must retain.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |