MS HB373 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If An Offender Is Convicted Of Capital Murder Then The Offender Shall Not Be Placed On Conditional Medical Release By The Commissioner And The Medical Director Of The Department Of Corrections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Conditional medical release; prohibit offenders convicted of capital murder from receiving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-20 | House | DR - TSDP: JB To CN |
2020-02-19 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To JB |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred To Corrections;Judiciary B |