MS HB1788 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Boards Of Supervisors Of George County, And Greene County, Mississippi, To Contract With The United States, Any State Or States Or Any Private Correctional Entity For The Housing Of Minimum Or Medium Security Offenders From Those Jurisdictions; To Provide That The Housing Of Such Offenders Shall Be In The George-greene County Correctional Facility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
George and Greene Counties; authorize to contract with U.S. and other states to house minimum/medium security offenders in regional correctional facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug McLeod [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-16 | House | Passed |
2016-04-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |