MS HB1742 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 909, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 941, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 958, Local And Private Laws Of 2008, To Remove The Repealer On The Provisions Of Law Which Create The Jackson Convention And Visitors Bureau And Impose A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants, Hotels And Motels For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Bureau; To Grant The Bureau The Authority To Enter Into Contracts Up To Ten Years, Generally, And To Enter Into Contracts For The Purpose Of Financing The Acquisition And Construction Of Buildings In Furtherance Of The Purposes Of The Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Jackson; delete repeal date on Jackson Convention and Visitors Bureau and expand authority of bureau to contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-04-22 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-27 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-27 | Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-03-27 | DR - TSDPCS: WM To LP | |
2010-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To WM | |
2010-03-19 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |