MS HB1728 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Civil Service Commission For The Harrison County Sheriff's Department; To Provide The Policies And Procedures Of Such Commission; To Provide For The Membership Of Such Commission; To Provide The Time That Such Commission Shall Meet; To Provide The Duties Of Such Commission And Their Compensation; To Provide That Any Employee Subject To Personnel Action May Have A Hearing; To Require Such Commission To Maintain A Roster Of All Personnel Employed By Such Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harrison County; create Civil Service Commission for the Harrison County Sheriff's Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-22 | Passed | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-04-01 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-04-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-27 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-27 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-27 | Amended | |
2010-03-27 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-24 | Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-03-03 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |