MS HB1702 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "public School Donation Tax Deduction And Dedicated Use Act"; To Amend Section 27-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A State Income Tax Deduction For Contributions Made By A Taxpayer To A Public School District; To Provide That Such Contributions May Be Designated By A Taxpayer For Specific Use By A School District; To Amend Section 37-7-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public School Donation Tax Deduction and Dedicated Use Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Rep. Tom Miles [D] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |