MS HB1689 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 97-13-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Person Who Disseminates A Deep Fake Shall Be Guilty Of A Crime If The Person Knows Or Had Reason To Know That The Information Being Disseminated Is A Deep Fake And The Dissemination Occurs Within Ninety Days Of An Election, Was Disseminated Without The Consent Of The Depicted Individual, And Was Disseminated With The Intent To Injure A Candidate, Influence The Result Of An Election Or Deter Any Person From Voting; To Provide Definitions; To Provide The Sentencing For The Crime; To Provide A Cause Of Action For Injunctive Relief In Certain Situations; To Provide Defenses To The Crime; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Election crime; create for dissemination of a deep fake within 90 days of an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: EL To JB |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Judiciary, Division B |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |