MS HB1644 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Human Services; And For Related Purposes, For The Fiscal Year 2011.
Title
Appropriation; Department of Human Services-Consolidated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-24 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-04-23 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-04-23 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-23 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-23 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-23 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Hyde-Smith,Hudson | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Warren,Scott | |
2010-03-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-17 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-19 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-18 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |