MS HB1601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Taxpayers To Establish First-time Home Buyer Savings Accounts; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide That The Amounts Contributed To A First-time Home Buyer Savings Account, Interest And Other Income Earned On An Account And Distributions From Such An Account That Are Used To Pay Eligible Costs Related To The Purchase Of A Single-family Residence Shall Be Excluded From The Gross Income Of The Account Holder Under The State Income Tax Law; To Amend Section 27-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; authorize first-time home buyers savings accounts and exclude contributions/distributions from gross income.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |