MS HB1415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That The Mississippi Public Service Commission Be Funded By Appropriations From The General Fund; To Amend Sections 77-1-6, 77-1-15, 77-1-29, 77-1-53, 77-3-8, 77-3-87, 77-3-89, 77-3-503, 77-3-507, 77-3-509, 77-7-127, 77-7-333, 77-7-337, 77-7-339, 77-9-489 And 77-11-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provisions Of Law Requiring Certain Expenses Of The Mississippi Public Service Commission To Be Defrayed By Appropriation From The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public Service Commission; remove from the provisions of the Mississippi Budget Transparency and Simplification Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |