MS HB1377 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Conditions For Parole Eligibility And To Provide Limitations On Inmate Eligibility To Petition The Sentencing Court For Parole Eligibility If The Inmate Is Serving A Sentence For A Crime Of Violence Or Nonviolence; To Provide That Any Person Who Was Under Age Eighteen When He Or She Committed A Crime And Is Not Otherwise Eligible For Parole, Shall Be Eligible For Parole Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 47-7-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Dates For The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Complete Case Plans For Parole-eligible Inmates To Ensure That The Plan Is Achievable; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Three Members Of The Mississippi Parole Board To Grant Parole To An Inmate Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence After June 30 1995; To Amend Section 47-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Four Members Of The Mississippi Parole Board To Grant Parole To A Sex Offender; To Amend Section 47-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Victim Or Designated Family Member Shall Be Provided An Opportunity To Be Heard By The Parole Board Prior To A Parole Decision; To Amend Section 47-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Certain Parole Hearings For Sex Offenders; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-33.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Regarding Department Discharge Plans For Released Inmates; To Repeal Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides A Minimum Time Offenders Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence Must Serve Before Release And A Minimum Percentage Of Other Sentences Other Offenders Must Serve Before Release; To Amend Section 47-5-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Number Of Transitional Reentry Center Beds; To Bring Forward Sections 47-5-931, 47-5-933 And 47-5-938, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Incarceration Of State Offenders In Certain Facilities, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Conditional Medical Release, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Return Of A Violator Of Parole Or Earned Release Supervision, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Power Of The Court To Place Defendants On Probation, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-34, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Post-release Supervision Program, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Terms And Conditions Of Probation, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Persons Who Supervise Those On Probation Or Parole, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Period Of Probation That Is Set By A Court, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-37.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Revocation Of Probation Or Post-release Supervision, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Community Service Revolving Fund, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 45-1-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Rule Making Power Of The Commissioner Of Public Safety, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 9-23-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Uniform Certification Process For Intervention And Certain Other Courts, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 99-39-5 And 99-39-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Certain Post-conviction Proceedings, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections omnibus bill; enact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenateDied On Calendar
2020-06-09SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-28SenateDR - TSDPAA: CR To AP
2020-05-12SenateReferred To Corrections;Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-03-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Williams-Barnes, Horan, Mickens)
2020-03-12HousePassed As Amended
2020-03-12HouseAmended
2020-03-12HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-11HouseRead the Third Time
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-03-03HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To CN
2020-02-26HouseDR - TSDPCS: CN To AP
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Corrections;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback