MS HB1324 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Section 73-60-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Was Repealed By Operation Of Law In 2013, To Revive The Home Inspector Regulatory Board; To Provide That The Powers And Duties Of The Mississippi Real Estate Commission In Regards To Home Inspectors Shall Be Transferred To The Mississippi Real Estate Appraisal Board; To Amend Sections 73-60-1, 73-60-3, 73-60-7, 73-60-9, 73-60-11 And 73-60-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Bring Forward Section 73-60-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Sections 73-60-21, 73-60-23, 73-60-27, 73-60-29, 73-60-31, 73-60-33, 73-60-35, 73-60-37, 73-60-39, 73-60-41, 73-60-45, 73-60-47 And 73-34-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Home Inspector Regulatory Board; revive and provide that MS Real Estate Appraisal Board shall regulate home inspectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Business and Commerce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 34 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |