MS HB1322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize An Income Tax Credit For Certain Railroad Reconstruction Or Replacement Expenditures Made By Class Ii And Class Iii Railroads; To Define Certain Terms For The Purposes Of This Act; To Provide The Amount Of The Tax Credit; To Provide That Any Unused Portion Of The Tax Credit May Be Carried Forward; To Provide That Any Unused Portion Of The Tax Credit May Be Transferred To Another Taxpayer; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; authorize credit for certain railroad reconstruction/replacement expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |