MS HB1253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-25-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That All-terrain Vehicles And Off-road Vehicles Are Motor Vehicles For The Purposes Of The Motor Vehicle Chop Shop, Stolen And Altered Property Act, Which Makes It Illegal To Alter A Vehicle Identification Number; And For Related Purposes.
Title
All-terrain vehicles; clarify inclusion in chop shop act to prohibit altering of VIN.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To JB |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Judiciary, Division B |
2015-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-02-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Massengill, Baker) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDP: JA To TR |
2015-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To JA |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Transportation;Judiciary A |