MS HB1247 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-29-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That The County Superintendent Of Education Shall Automatically Serve As A Member Of The Board Of A Community College District; To Provide That The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County Within A Community College District May Appoint The County Superintendent Or Another Qualified Elector From The Respective County At Large To Serve On The Board Of Trustees; To Amend Section 37-29-457, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That The Superintendent Of Special Municipal Separate School District In Adams County Automatically Serve As A Member Of The Copiah-lincoln Community College District Board Of Trustees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community college districts boards of trustees; remove requirement for automatic appointment of county superintendent of education to serve on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-03-29 | House | Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost |
2019-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (91st), Bennett, Roberson) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Tollison,Polk |
2019-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,Roberson,DeLano |
2019-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | House | Rereferred To Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |