MS HB1170 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-173-1, 37-173-9 And 37-173-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Dyslexia Therapy Scholarship For Students With Dyslexia Program By Making Certified Academic Language Therapists (calt) Eligible To Be Employed By School Districts To Provide Dyslexia Therapy Services; To Amend Section 37-106-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dyslexia Therapy Scholarship for Students with Dyslexia Program; expand to allow certified academic language therapists (CALT); to provide dyslexia therapy services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2022-01-26 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 106 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 173 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 173 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 173 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |