MS HB1076 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-103-302, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Deposit Into The State Treasury Of Certain Funds Received By Or On Behalf Of The State Of Mississippi Through A Negotiated Settlement For Economic Damages In Connection With The Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oil spill settlement funds; revise provisions regarding deposit into state treasury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |