MO SR626 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - S adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the President to take measures and support policies that ensure long-term American energy leadership, security, and progress
Title
Urges the President to take measures and support policies that ensure long-term American energy leadership, security, and progress
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | S adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | S Offered |