MO SB897 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 897-Hegeman, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 & HA 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 897-Hegeman, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 & HA 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes penalties for taxes paid under protest or as part of a disputed assessment
Title
Removes penalties for taxes paid under protest or as part of a disputed assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 897 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 897 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 897 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 897 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 897 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 897-Hegeman, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 & HA 5 |
2016-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC defeated |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Love)--(5722S01.07H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Rizzo)--(5722S01.06H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 3 H offered & withdrawn (Alferman)--(5722S01.10H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(5722S01.03H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5722S01.09H) |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2016-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee - Consent |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | S First Read--SB 897-Hegeman |