MO SB875 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4930S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that no public school shall be a member of a statewide activities association if such association prohibits a home school student from participating in any event or activity offered by a public school in the school district in which the student resides

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that no public school shall be a member of a statewide activities association if such association prohibits a home school student from participating in any event or activity offered by a public school in the school district in which the student resides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4930S.04C)
2020-03-03SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2020-02-20SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2020-01-14SenateS First Read--SB 875-Emery

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback