MO SB847 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Sen. Ronald Richard [R] | Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 847 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-26 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | Laid over |
2016-04-26 | House | Taken up |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Not Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-02-23 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-22 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SS#2, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(5594S04.06S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S withdrawn |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#2 S withdrawn |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & withdrawn (Sifton)--(5594S04.08S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Sifton)--(5594S04.07S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 S withdrawn |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Sifton)--(5594S04.02S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Sifton)--(5594S04.01S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Emery)--(5594S.04F) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered (Nasheed)--(5594S02.01F) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Nasheed)--(5594S01.01S) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SS S offered (Emery)--(5594S.02F) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 847-Emery and Richard |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled |